Trustees ORSETT PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Charity number: 211034
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDNA MAY FOX | Chair |
|
||||||
James Dickson | Trustee | 15 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Tracy Sullivan | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Debbie Roch | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev SUE MANN | Trustee | 13 July 2016 |
|
|||||
TED SARGEANT | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
|||||
BARRY BARNES | Trustee | 09 July 2014 |
|
|||||
Paul Wakeling | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|||||
AMANDA ELIZABETH COLBURN | Trustee |
|
||||||
TRACY DOROTHY PIGG | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.