Trustees AMPNEY CRUCIS PARISH HALL

Charity Number: 212434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MRS A BRIDGES Chair
None on record
Kathleen Susan Philips Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
Michelle Evans Trustee 06 March 2024
None on record
Jacqueline Mary Leadbeater Trustee 11 May 2023
None on record
Linda Ann Benham Trustee 19 September 2022
None on record
Mark Lee Gluning Trustee 09 March 2022
None on record
Rebecca Jones Trustee 19 May 2014
None on record