Accounts and annual returns RICHARD KNIGHT CHARITY

Charity number: 213808
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 21 July 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 10 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 09 October 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 28 February 2007 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2005 22 March 2006 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required