Financial history RICHARD KNIGHT CHARITY

Charity number: 213808
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £1.16k £1.22k £971 £1.33k £1.14k
Total expenditure £995 £985 £1.15k £1.07k £1.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A