Accounts and annual returns POOR'S GRAZING RIGHTS

Charity number: 217321
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 09 April 2013 12 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 09 April 2012 12 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2012 Not Required
Annual return 09 April 2011 18 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2011 Not Required
Annual return 09 April 2010 31 August 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 09 April 2010 Not Required