Financial history POOR'S GRAZING RIGHTS

Charity number: 217321
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 09/04/2009 09/04/2010 09/04/2011 09/04/2012 09/04/2013
Total gross income £50 £20 £20 £20 £0
Total expenditure £60 £60 £60 £60 £41
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A