Financial history CANADIAN VETERANS ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM (BILLY BUTLIN'S TRUST FUND)

Charity number: 218949
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £6.67k £3.12k £3.14k £2.25k £53.45k
Total expenditure £17.77k £10.39k £10.78k £11.84k £18.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0