Accounts and annual returns MACCLESFIELD DISTRICT COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity number: 220609
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 29 August 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 30 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 25 November 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2009 18 November 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 23 November 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 06 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 06 November 2008 On Time