Governing document MACCLESFIELD DISTRICT COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE
Charity number: 220609
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JULY 1965 AS AMENDED 12 OCTOBER 1970, 1 MAY 1974, 9 JULY 1990, 27 JANUARY 1994 AND 22 SEPTEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT OF MACCLESFIELD AND THE TOWN OF THE COUNCIL OF CONGLETON AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH, AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DISTRICT OF MACCLESFIELD AND CONGLETON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.