Accounts and annual returns WEST NORWOOD LODGE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 221434
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2014 16 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2013 08 July 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2013 Not Required