Financial history DIXON ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 223045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.31k £32.48k £32.64k £32.89k £37.27k
Total expenditure £27.38k £33.12k £25.61k £28.37k £39.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A