Governing document DIXON ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Charity number: 223045

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 27 MARCH 1974. AS VARIED BY A SCHEME DATED 24TH NOVEMBER 1995. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 3RD JUNE 2003 AND 22 MAY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE CHARITY OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
THE PARISHES OF CHISTLETON, COTTON ABBOTTS, COTTON EDMUNDS, LITTLETON AND ROWTON IN THE COUNTY OF CHESTER.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.