Accounts and annual returns THE MARY CRAVEN TRUST

Charity number: 223286
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 December 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 16 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required