Governing document THE MARY CRAVEN TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 22/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/01/2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/08/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/09/2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 APR 2020
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR ACCOMMODATION.
Area of benefit
SCARBOROUGH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.