Trustees LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF TAMWORTH HOSPITALS

Charity number: 225715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anthony Kenneth Smith Trustee 15 April 2024
None on record
Roger William Jackson Trustee 04 April 2021
None on record
Carol Molloy Mrs Trustee 13 April 2020
None on record
Nina Archer Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Joan O'Brien Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Brenda Beames Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
June Alldritt Treasurer Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Vivienne Airdrie Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Kathleen Jones Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Gwen Kingsley Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Derek Hoey Trustee 01 May 2018
None on record
Linda Jean Jackson Mrs Trustee 12 March 2018
None on record
Samuel John Ellicott Trustee
None on record