Financial history LOCKER FAMILY TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 227004
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £5.29k £5.55k £5.99k £9.19k £34
Total expenditure £10.74k £9.72k £8.71k £253.28k £23.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A