Accounts and annual returns WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - MARNHULL
Charity number: 229495
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2008 | 09 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2007 | 10 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2006 | 12 July 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2005 | 15 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2004 | 26 July 2005 | 210 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window