Financial history WOMEN'S INSTITUTE - MARNHULL

Charity number: 229495
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2004 28/02/2005 28/02/2006 28/02/2007 29/02/2008
Total gross income £2.30k £1.90k £1.84k £2.58k £2.08k
Total expenditure £2.58k £2.09k £1.64k £2.29k £2.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A