Accounts and annual returns THE FREE CHURCH OF WILTON TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 230363
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2017 14 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 28 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2015 07 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 Not Required