Financial history THE FREE CHURCH OF WILTON TRUST FUND

Charity number: 230363
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2013 28/02/2014 28/02/2015 28/02/2016 28/02/2017
Total gross income £25 £25 £25 £1.01k £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0