Accounts and annual returns MILDMAY BUILDINGS (HULL) LTD

Charity number: 231059
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2010 27 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2009 02 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2008 13 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2008 13 January 2009 On Time