Financial history MILDMAY BUILDINGS (HULL) LTD

Charity number: 231059
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 05/04/2010
Total gross income £9.78k £9.40k £10.75k £5.95k £454
Total expenditure £16.82k £13.48k £31.01k £15.02k £1.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A