Linked charities CHARITIES FOR POOR MEN OF THE PRINTING INDUSTRY AND ALLIED TRADES
Charity Number: 232040
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 3 NOVEMBER 1931 AND SCHEME OF 5 JULY 1967 VARIED BY SCHEME OF 14 JANUARY 1972
Charitable objects
BENEIT OF MEN WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN THE PRINTING INDUSTRY OR ALLIED TRADES OR IN THE DISTRIBUTIVE TRADES THEROF WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 03 December 1963 : Standard registration
- 08 December 1997 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.