Accounts and annual returns LABORATORY ANIMAL SCIENCE ASSOCIATION (L A S A )

Charity Number: 233068
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2016 27 February 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 27 February 2017 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2015 02 February 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 02 February 2016 On Time
Annual return 30 June 2014 23 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 December 2014 On Time