Accounts and annual returns KIPLING CHARITY

Charity number: 233358
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 01 April 2017 05 December 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 21 February 2017 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required