Financial history KIPLING CHARITY

Charity number: 233358
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/03/2013 29/03/2014 31/03/2015 01/04/2016 01/04/2017
Total gross income £20 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0