Financial history THE TREVOR CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 234619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £3.04k £2.51k £2.69k £2.69k £3.62k
Total expenditure £348 £324 £147 £500 £900
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A