Accounts and annual returns MILFORD UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 234709
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 29 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 22 May 2024 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required