Accounts and annual returns ELIZABETH HINTON

Charity number: 236287
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 17 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 19 September 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2008 02 March 2009 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 26 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 14 August 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 Not Required