Financial history CONVENT OF THE RELIGIOUS ORDER OF ST JOSEPH DE CLUNY

Charity Number: 237340
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 30/06/2015
Total gross income £1.35m £1.36m £1.40m £1.37m £2.18m
Total expenditure £1.39m £1.40m £1.44m £2.73m £2.06m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Donations and legacies £159.82k £135.60k £135.13k £93.77k £126.59k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.16m £1.21m £1.23m £1.27m £2.04m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £7.00k £7.76k £18.92k £4.22k £0
Income - Other £17.51k £9.66k £11.63k £8.35k £10.62k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.38m £1.39m £1.43m £2.73m £1.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £10.28k £10.97k £11.94k £0 £17.14k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £48.95k