Financial history THE HERTFORDSHIRE REGIMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 239572
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £2.33k £2.28k £2.42k £1.79k £325
Total expenditure £2.34k £2.76k £2.16k £1.97k £3.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A