Financial history CARLTON COLVILLE FUEL OR POOR'S ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 242083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £19.62k £5.33k £2.61k £12.33k £39.71k
Total expenditure £18.80k £17.52k £17.52k £17.65k £16.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A