Accounts and annual returns THE BIRMINGHAM AND DISTRICT BUTCHERS AND PORK BUTCHERS ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 242561
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2009 18 October 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2008 09 December 2009 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 30 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required