Financial history LANE END VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 244024
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £24.15k £9.34k £15.81k £21.93k £25.68k
Total expenditure £16.44k £10.95k £20.25k £27.65k £21.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A