Accounts and annual returns THE MUSGRAVE HOMES

Charity number: 245213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 04 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 04 February 2025 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 04 February 2025 365 days late
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 15 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 15 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window