Financial history THE MUSGRAVE HOMES

Charity number: 245213
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £37.79k £46.50k £44.22k £47.78k £45.08k
Total expenditure £44.66k £16.32k £27.29k £51.30k £36.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A