Financial history JOHN THEODORE WOOD CHARITY

Charity number: 246859
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £4.54k £4.83k £4.80k £4.91k £1.01k
Total expenditure £3.88k £2.59k £408 £450 £129.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A