Accounts and annual returns JOSEPH BENTLEY FOR POOR OF FORMER CLASKETGATE WESLEYAN CHAPEL

Charity number: 249059
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 22 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2013 09 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2012 14 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2011 23 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required