Accounts and annual returns WARRINGTON YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 250114
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 November 2018 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 November 2018 8 days late
Annual return 31 December 2016 03 May 2018 184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 May 2018 184 days late