Accounts and annual returns POLISH CITIZENS COMMITTEE FOR REFUGEES
Charity number: 250774
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 02 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 18 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 12 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 29 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 March 2006 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 05 April 2006 | 429 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window