Accounts and annual returns THE SISTERS OF CHARITY OF ST VINCENT DE PAUL MADRID SANTA LUISA PROVINCE

Charity number: 251388
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 April 2012 25 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2012 10 July 2012 On Time
Annual return 03 April 2011 23 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2011 28 March 2012 54 days late
Annual return 03 April 2010 14 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2010 14 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 03 April 2009 12 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 April 2009 12 January 2010 On Time