Financial history FREDERICK COOLING TOWNSEND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 251738
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2005 05/04/2006 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009
Total gross income £1.42k £1.49k £1.61k £1.77k £1.85k
Total expenditure £1.15k £1.60k £1.57k £1.79k £1.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A