Governing document FRIENDS OF THE ROYAL CORNWALL HOSPITAL
Charity number: 252083

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/12/1964 AS AMENDED ON 25/11/2002 AS AMENDED ON 18/08/2009 AS AMENDED ON 18/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/2007 as amended on 27 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
CORNWALL
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.