Accounts and annual returns THE STRATEGIC PLANNING SOCIETY

Charity number: 253879
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2018 04 September 2019 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required