Financial history THE STRATEGIC PLANNING SOCIETY

Charity number: 253879
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018
Total gross income £44.17k £38.43k £33.91k £27.86k £22.78k
Total expenditure £38.70k £27.90k £21.64k £22.31k £28.45k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A