Financial history SIR EDWARD MARSHALL HALL FOR NEEDY MEMBERS OF THE INNER TEMPLE

Charity number: 254906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £40.04k £38.31k £38.90k £40.25k £42.24k
Total expenditure £34.97k £71.80k £52.86k £33.57k £35.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A