Trustees SIR EDWARD MARSHALL HALL FOR NEEDY MEMBERS OF THE INNER TEMPLE
Charity number: 254906

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN WAITE QC | Chair | 17 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Gough | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hanif Mussa | Trustee | 01 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Martin | Trustee | 12 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Heather Oliver | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HILARY CALDECOTT QC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIMOTHY ROGER CHARLTON QC | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.