Governing document THE INSTITUTION OF AGRICULTURAL ENGINEERS

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JAN 1960 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 OCT 1962 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 APR 1965 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 SEP 1968 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 JUL 1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 NOV 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 MAY 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 NOV 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 FEB 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND CO-ORDINATE THE STUDY, DEVELOPMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCIENCE OF AGRICULTURAL ENGINEERING IN ALL ITS BRANCHES, AND TO PROMOTE THE ACQUISITION OF THAT KNOWLEDGE WHICH CONSTITUTES THE SCIENCE OF AGRICULTURAL ENGINEERING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.