Trustees LEIGHTON BUZZARD MENCAP
Charity number: 259104

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mrs GAYE BEATTIE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Evelyn Bennett | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Porter | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Garcia | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Lunn | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Francis McClinton | Trustee | 28 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Solomon | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER INGRAM | Trustee | 22 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NELSON DEACON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.