Accounts and annual returns SHILLINGTON AND STONDON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 259215
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2010 28 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 28 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required